IN HCR0030 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Senators Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buck, Charbonneau, Crane, Delph, Eckerty, Ford, Freeman, Head, Hershman, Holdman, Kenley, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Long, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Raatz, Randolph, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Smith J, Stoops, Tallian, Taylor G, Walker, Young M, Zakas, Zay added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Petitioning the National Park Service to complete the Eastern Legacy Special Resource Study mandated by Congress in 2008 and to recommend inclusion of the Eastern Legacy sites, which include Indiana locations, in the Lewis and Clark National Historic Trail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petitioning the National Park Service to complete the Eastern Legacy Special Resource Study mandated by Congress in 2008 and to recommend inclusion of the Eastern Legacy sites, which include Indiana locations, in the Lewis and Clark National Historic Trail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenateSenators Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buck, Charbonneau, Crane, Delph, Eckerty, Ford, Freeman, Head, Hershman, Holdman, Kenley, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Long, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Raatz, Randolph, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Smith J, Stoops, Tallian, Taylor G, Walker, Young M, Zakas, Zay added as cosponsors
2017-04-13SenateSecond reading: adopted voice vote
2017-04-12SenateSenators Doriot, Glick, Crider, Tomes added as cosponsors
2017-04-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-03-13SenateSenator Houchin added as second sponsor
2017-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-27HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Grooms
2017-02-27HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2017-02-27HouseCoauthored by Representatives Clere and Pierce
2017-02-27HouseAuthored by Representative Saunders

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback