IN HCR0027 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Maurice Lingham Burns, Sr.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Maurice Lingham Burns, Sr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | First reading: adopted standing vote |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Randolph |
2022-02-22 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Taylor G, Breaux, Melton |
2022-02-22 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2022-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Shackleford, Bartlett, Harris, Hatcher, Jackson, Pack, Porter, Smith V, Summers |
2022-02-22 | House | Authored by Representative Pryor |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/resolutions/house/concurrent/27/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/b/1/d0b149f0/HC0027.01.INTR.pdf |