IN HCR0023 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - First reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename a part of U.S. Highway 31 between Main Street and East Street in the city of Austin as "Berley Goodin Way".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename a part of U.S. Highway 31 between Main Street and East Street in the city of Austin as "Berley Goodin Way".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-25 - House - House - First reading: adopted (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-10SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2014-03-06SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-27SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs
2014-02-25HouseFirst reading: adopted Roll Call 288: yeas 91 and nays 0
2014-02-25HouseSenator Wyss added as sponsor.
2014-02-20HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-11HouseCoauthored by Representative Soliday.
2014-02-11HouseAuthored by Representative Stemler.
2014-02-03HouseAssigned to Roads and Transportation.

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback