IN HCR0021 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing Marine Corporal John C. Bishop.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing Marine Corporal John C. Bishop.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05SenateReturned to the House
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading: adopted standing vote
2021-03-30SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-03-08HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-03-08HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Perfect
2021-03-08HouseSecond reading: adopted Roll Call 244: yeas 92, nays 0
2021-03-04HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
2021-03-01HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/resolutions/house/concurrent/21
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/d/d/4cddeee6/HC0021.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/7/0/487003ab/HC0021.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/e/2/67e2c31d/HC0021.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/b/7/84b7c143/HC0021.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/3/b/3e3b72fa/HC0021.03.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/d/0/c8d04b87/HC0021.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/8/e/268ef19c/HC0021.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/1/4/ca141ee1/HC0021.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/6/7/e66794ac/HC0021.244_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/3/5/003547de/HC0021.02.COMH.01.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback