IN HCR0021 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-9)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the bridge along State Road 28 over U.S. Highway 31 after Tipton County Deputy Jacob Calvin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the bridge along State Road 28 over U.S. Highway 31 after Tipton County Deputy Jacob Calvin.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateReturned to the House
2018-03-14SenateSenators Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Delph, Doriot, Eckerty, Ford, Freeman, Glick, Grooms, Head, Holdman, Houchin, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Long, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Raatz, Randolph, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Smith, Spartz V, Stoops, Tallian, Taylor, Tomes, Walker, Young, M., Zakas, Zay added as cosponsors
2018-03-14SenateSecond reading: adopted standing vote
2018-03-13SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-03-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2018-03-07HouseReferred to the Senate
2018-03-07HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Buck
2018-03-07HouseSecond reading: adopted Roll Call 341: yeas 86, nays 0
2018-03-06HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
2018-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback