IN HCR0008 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-9)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-9)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that part of U.S. Highway 231 from Interstate Highway 69 to the city of Bloomfield the "Donald W. Dean Memorial Highway".
Title
Urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that part of U.S. Highway 231 from Interstate Highway 69 to the city of Bloomfield the "Donald W. Dean Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senators Alting, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buck, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Delph, Doriot, Eckerty, Ford, Freeman, Glick, Grooms, Head, Hershman, Holdman, Houchin, Kenley, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Long, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Raatz, Randolph, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Smith J, Stoops, Tallian, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker, Young M, Zakas, Zay added as cosponsors |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Representative Borders added as coauthor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2017-04-03 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bassler |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 362: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2017-01-23 | House | Authored by Representative Ellington |