IN HCR0003 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-13)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Senator Zakas added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Sammy Lee Davis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Sammy Lee Davis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27SenateSenator Zakas added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator M. Young added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator R. Young added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Yoder added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Wyss added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Waterman added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Waltz added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Walker added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Tomes added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Taylor added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Steele added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Smith added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Skinner added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Schneider added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Paul added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Nugent added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Mrvan added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Mishler added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Pat Miller added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Pete Miller added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Merritt added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Long added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Leising added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Landske added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Kenley added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Hume added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Holdman added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Hershman added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Head added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Grooms added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Glick added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Eckerty added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Delph added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Crider added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Charbonneau added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Broden added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Breaux added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Bray added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Boots added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Becker added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Banks added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Arnold added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Alting added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSecond reading: adopted voice vote
2014-02-25SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-29HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2014-01-29HouseSenator Waterman added as sponsor.
2014-01-29SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs
2014-01-16HouseCoauthored by Representative Baird.
2014-01-16HouseAuthored by Representative Heaton.
2014-01-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback