IN HB1622 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Record of county and city votes. Requires a county that has an Internet web site and a population of more than 100,000, a consolidated city, or a second class city that maintains an Internet web site to post on the web site the roll call votes of the executive and fiscal body (of a county) and the legislative body (of a municipality) within three business days after: (1) the date the roll call vote is taken if the county's or city's software is able to generate a roll call vote; and (2) if the county's or city's software is not
Title
Record of county and city votes. Requires a county that has an Internet web site and a population of more than 100,000, a consolidated city, or a second class city that maintains an Internet web site to post on the web site the roll call votes of the executive and fiscal body (of a county) and the legislative body (of a municipality) within three business days after: (1) the date the roll call vote is taken if the county's or city's software is able to generate a roll call vote; and (2) if the county's or city's software is not
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Public Law 204 |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 493: yeas 45, nays 1 |
2017-04-20 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 508: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Sandlin, Niezgodski and Freeman |
2017-04-10 | House | House advisors appointed: Mayfield, Richardson and Austin |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Walker and Breaux |
2017-04-10 | House | House conferees appointed: Speedy and Moed |
2017-04-06 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 320: yeas 45, nays 2 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-20 | House | Representative Austin added as coauthor |
2017-02-20 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Sandlin and Freeman |
2017-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 145: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2017-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2017-01-23 | House | Authored by Representative Speedy |