IN HB1603 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Public Law 244
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Property tax appeals. Provides that when a deadline imposed upon a political subdivision, the department of local government finance, or the Indiana board in the property tax statutes is not a business day, the last day for the political subdivision, the department of local government finance, or the Indiana board to take the action required is the first business day after the stated deadline. Allows the fiscal officer of a taxing unit to establish a property tax assessment appeals fund to hold property tax receipts that are attributable to an increase in the taxing unit's tax rate caused by a

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax appeals. Provides that when a deadline imposed upon a political subdivision, the department of local government finance, or the Indiana board in the property tax statutes is not a business day, the last day for the political subdivision, the department of local government finance, or the Indiana board to take the action required is the first business day after the stated deadline. Allows the fiscal officer of a taxing unit to establish a property tax assessment appeals fund to hold property tax receipts that are attributable to an increase in the taxing unit's tax rate caused by a

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-06HousePublic Law 244
2015-05-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-28SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 523: yeas 47, nays 0
2015-04-28HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 546: yeas 73, nays 0
2015-04-15SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Hershman, Mrvan, and Eckerty
2015-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Head and Broden
2015-04-15HouseMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-14HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Price, Smith M and Stemler
2015-04-14HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Smaltz and Pryor
2015-04-14HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2015-03-25SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2015-03-24SenateSenator Eckerty added as second sponsor
2015-03-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 333: yeas 49, nays 1
2015-03-23SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2015-03-23SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-02SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2015-02-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-24HouseSenator Head added as sponsor
2015-02-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 95, nays 0
2015-02-23HouseReread second time: ordered engrossed
2015-02-19HouseRepresentative Pryor added as coauthor
2015-02-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-16HouseSecond Reading: recommitted to Committee on Local Government
2015-02-10HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-29HouseRepresentative Ober added as coauthor
2015-01-20HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2015-01-20HouseCoauthored by Representative Price
2015-01-20HouseAuthored by Representative Smaltz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1603/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/e/2/c7e26010/HB1603.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/3/f/ff3f65b5/HB1603.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/f/0/17f01e8c/HB1603.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/c/3/94c3b3fd/HB1603.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/6/d/8e6df4e6/HB1603.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/3/f/bb3f3dda/HB1603.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/b/3/7fb3a810/HB1603.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/4/1/05413e68/HB1603.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/c/9/52c909d0/HB1603.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/9/5/e59547ac/HB1603.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/5/e/195ecf4e/HB1603.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/3/a/2b3a227f/HB1603.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/e/d/94edefd1/HB1603.03.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/9/9/dc99b9d6/HB1603.254.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/1/b/de1bd34f/HB1603.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/1/5/3a150ffd/HB1603.333.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/b/a/3ebacb87/HB1603.523.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/7/9/2b798eed/HB1603.546.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback