IN HB1575 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Hearing: Mar 30 @ 10:00 am in Room 233
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Residential building commission. Establishes the residential building commission (building commission) within the department of homeland security. Provides that the building commission has exclusive jurisdiction for the review and adoption of building codes and standards that regulate the construction of dwellings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential building commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Campbell) failed (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2023-02-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2023-02-20HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 72, nays 25
2023-02-20HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Rogers and Garten
2023-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2023-02-16HouseAmendment #1 (Campbell) failed; Roll Call 142: yeas 28, nays 62
2023-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-01-19HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2023-01-19HouseAuthored by Representative O'Brien
2023-01-19HouseCoauthored by Representatives Frye R, Bartels, Miller D

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback