IN HB1575 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that legislator members of the commission for a drug free Indiana are voting members. (Under current law, the legislator members are nonvoting members.)
Title
Commission for a drug free Indiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 87 |
2013-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 324: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2013-02-25 | House | Representative Washburne added as coauthor |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Grooms and Skinner |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative V. Smith |