IN HB1573 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-20 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-20 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that after December 31, 2012, in all counties other than Marion County, the county board of commissioners is the county executive and the county council is the county legislative body. Specifies that after December 31, 2012, certain powers currently exercised by a county's board of commissioners shall be exercised by the county council. Specifies that, in counties other than Marion County, the budget estimates of each county officer, each court, and all other county departments and agencies shall be submitted to the county executive. Provides that the county executive shall review the budget estimates and adopt a consolidated budget estimate for the county that includes budget estimates for all county officers, departments, and agencies. Requires the county auditor to present the consolidated budget estimate for the county to the county fiscal body for adoption. Provides that the executive of each county (other than Marion County) shall before January 1, 2013, adopt a policy and procedures manual that applies to all county officers, officials, and employees other than judges. Specifies that the county executive shall include in the manual those policy and procedures that the county executive believes are appropriate to guide the actions of county officers, officials, and employees in conducting the business of county government. Requires that the manual must include a county ethics policy. Provides that not later than July 1, 2012, the office of the attorney general shall develop a model ethics policy to assist county executives in adopting the county ethics policy.
Title
County government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative Soliday |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1573 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN1573.1.html |