IN HB1569 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Professional licensing matters. Provides for an annual renewal process for appraisal management companies. Changes the designation of certified dietician to licensed dietician. Allows for a hearing aid dealer in training to fit or dispense hearing aids while under the supervision and direction of an individual who holds a temporary or valid hearing aid dealer certificate of registration. Defines a conviction of concern. Amends a provision concerning the way a conviction for a crime of concern affects an individual with a professional license or certification. Removes a provision that requires a dental hygienist to obtain and maintain a national provider identifier number. Allows for the state board of dentistry (board) to issue dental residency permits and dental faculty licenses. (Current law allows for the board to issue limited dental residency permits and limited faculty licenses.) Removes a provision that prohibits an Indiana dental school from having more than 10% of its full-time faculty licensed with an instructor's license. Makes various changes to provisions concerning how a conviction for a crime of concern affects an individual with a professional license or certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional licensing matters. Provides for an annual renewal process for appraisal management companies. Changes the designation of certified dietician to licensed dietician. Allows for a hearing aid dealer in training to fit or dispense hearing aids while under the supervision and direction of an individual who holds a temporary or valid hearing aid dealer certificate of registration. Defines a conviction of concern. Amends a provision concerning the way a conviction for a crime of concern affects an individual with a professional license or certification. Removes a provision that requires a dental hygienist to obtain and maintain a national provider identifier number. Allows for the state board of dentistry (board) to issue dental residency permits and dental faculty licenses. (Current law allows for the board to issue limited dental residency permits and limited faculty licenses.) Removes a provision that prohibits an Indiana dental school from having more than 10% of its full-time faculty licensed with an instructor's license. Makes various changes to provisions concerning how a conviction for a crime of concern affects an individual with a professional license or certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePublic Law 90
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 509: yeas 85, nays 4
2019-04-11HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 407: yeas 47, nays 1
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenator Doriot added as second sponsor
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-07HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Perfect
2019-02-07HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 93, nays 0
2019-02-05HouseRepresentatives Davisson and Bacon added as coauthors
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseRepresentative Moseley added as coauthor
2019-01-29HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2019-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Zent

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1569/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/a/b/0bab3b61/HB1569.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/0/a/0d0af008/HB1569.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/8/b/e38ba492/HB1569.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/d/9/b7d9d290/HB1569.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/d/4/b4d49d43/HB1569.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/7/4/fb74a6a3/HB1569.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/f/c/aefc1997/HB1569.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/5/c/4d5c0b9c/HB1569.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/a/b/33ab4d1b/HB1569.117.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/2/a/5e2a7254/HB1569.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/7/7/1a77c328/HB1569.407.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/d/0/7ad0e89a/HB1569.509.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback