IN HB1564 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Secretary of education. Organizes and corrects statutes, as required by P.L.8-2019 (HEA 1005-2019), concerning the state superintendent of public instruction. Makes changes, as applicable, from the state superintendent of public instruction as an elected position to the secretary of education as an appointed position. Provides that, if the office of a state officer is abolished, certain ethics and conflict of interest provisions continue to apply to the former state officer. Provides that all powers, duties, agreements, liabilities, property, and records of the state superintendent of public instruction are transferred to the secretary of education, as the successor to the state superintendent of public instruction. Provides that the secretary of education shall enter into and maintain a contract for professional development services with an organization that provides a nationally recognized training program for professional development in computer science education from early learning through postsecondary education. (The current provision provides that the state superintendent of public instruction shall, before August 1, 2018, enter into a contract for the professional development services.) Repeals the following: (1) Provisions concerning the definition of "state superintendent" and "office". (2) A provision regarding the education dispute resolution working group. (3) A provision that requires, not later than June 30, 2020, the governing body of the Muncie Community school corporation to provide a report on the plan for the long term fiscal viability and academic innovation of the Muncie Community school corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secretary of education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HousePublic Law 43
2021-04-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-24SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-23SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2021-03-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-02SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Baldwin and Leising
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 94, nays 0
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1564/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/a/c/a9acb744/HB1564.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/c/4/e1c46c10/HB1564.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/e/5/d3e50a89/HB1564.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/e/3/53e3687c/HB1564.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/b/f/86bf7efe/HB1564.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/1/8/cc18899f/HB1564.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/4/d/f24dacfa/HB1564.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/7/d/247d0ca8/HB1564.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/e/a/6bea14cf/HB1564.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/5/6/fb56310c/HB1564.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/9/9/eb993552/HB1564.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/2/e/d82e2b55/HB1564.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/f/1/c8f105dc/HB1564.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/d/0/39d0243b/HB1564.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/6/2/ae6287b9/HB1564.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/3/d/123d0ab7/HB1564.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/2/8/512874ff/HB1564.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/e/5/f0e5f1d9/HB1564.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/d/6/8ed64eac/HB1564.157_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/a/6/67a6c9b4/HB1564.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/9/e/889eb700/HB1564.269_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback