IN HB1549 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Senate advisors appointed: Crane and Yoder
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Education matters. Allows the priority enrollment period for the prekindergarten pilot program to begin later than April 1, 2021, in calendar year 2021. Provides that a school corporation may not enter into or renew a contract with an outside vendor to operate or manage a dedicated virtual education school of the school corporation unless the school corporation submits the most recent contract or proposed contract with the vendor to the department of education (department). Amends limits on the percentage of appropriated funds that may be used for grants to limited eligibility children under the prekindergarten pilot program. Provides that the department of education (department) shall make informational material that is evidenced based available on the department's Internet web site that may help teachers and other school employees identify a student who may have been impacted by trauma. Requires the department to provide a notice to each school corporation and charter school on how to access the informational material. Provides that a charter school may give enrollment preference to children who attend another charter school that is closed because of action by the state board of education (state board). Establishes the Cambridge International program (program). Requires the department to: (1) administer the program; and (2) submit a report regarding the program to the state board each year. Establishes the Indiana postsecondary prior learning assessment clearinghouse (clearinghouse). Requires the governor to direct the commission, department, and governor's workforce cabinet (cabinet), in collaboration with state educational institutions, to: (1) develop and regularly update the clearinghouse; and (2) collect information concerning prior learning assessments used by state educational institutions to award advanced standing or postsecondary credit. Requires each state educational institution to report prior learning assessment information. Requires the commission, department, and the cabinet to publish the clearinghouse information on its respective Internet web site. Requires the governor to direct the commission, department, and cabinet, in consultation with state educational institutions, to prepare model guidance and informational resources concerning postsecondary enrollment opportunities that incorporate work based learning experiences. Requires the governor to direct the commission, department, and cabinet to publish model guidance and information resources on its respective Internet web site. Prohibits a charter school organizer from entering into contracts under which an officer or employee of the organizer or a relative of an officer or employee of the organizer will receive compensation or proceeds. Provides an exception for de minimis contracts valued at $1,000 or less. Repeals a provision regarding high school credit for Cambridge International courses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateSenate advisors appointed: Crane and Yoder
2021-04-14SenateSenate conferees appointed: Raatz and Ford J.D.
2021-04-14HouseHouse advisors appointed: Goodrich, Cook, Klinker and Pfaff
2021-04-14HouseHouse conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
2021-04-14HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2021-04-14HouseMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-14SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 430: yeas 50, nays 0
2021-04-12SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-04-08SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-04-05SenateSenator Kruse added as third sponsor
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Crane
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 155: yeas 94, nays 0
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1549/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/4/e/8e4e5f34/HB1549.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/a/a/4baa4a39/HB1549.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/a/c/b0ac2167/HB1549.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/c/c/31ccfa91/HB1549.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/a/5/00a57909/HB1549.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/d/6/79d6a005/HB1549.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/9/8/4e9869ac/HB1549.04.COMS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/3/1/b03109b3/HB1549.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/c/9/96c90ea9/HB1549.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/9/6/649673b3/HB1549.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/e/6/17e69405/HB1549.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/1/7/b1175478/HB1549.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/2/2/e2227c08/HB1549.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/2/0/1e2085be/HB1549.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/6/5/c265b28b/HB1549.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/0/7/e107770c/HB1549.03.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/6/b/9c6b9a1d/HB1549.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/4/5/be45cd50/HB1549.04.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/9/3/d89321ef/HB1549.04.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/f/a/c5faaca0/HB1549.04.COMS.DIS01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/5/3/57530710/HB1549.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/c/8/f9c8ad7b/HB1549.155_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/c/a/28ca5bf2/HB1549.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/3/3/66330f49/HB1549.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/9/9/9999738f/HB1549.430_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback