IN HB1549 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grain buyer and warehouse operators. Increases the fee for inspecting a moisture testing device. Requires the Indiana grain buyers and warehouse licensing agency (agency) to employ all necessary employees to administer the grain buyer and warehouse laws. Defines "daily position record", "grain coproducts", and "seed inventory". Amends the definition of "grain assets". Changes the organization that administers the series 3 examination. Provides that an entity associated with a person with a revoked or suspended license may not operate as a grain buyer or warehouse. Adds seed inventory to the list of a warehouse's or grain buyer's (licensee's) unencumbered assets. Increases
Title
Grain buyer and warehouse operators. Increases the fee for inspecting a moisture testing device. Requires the Indiana grain buyers and warehouse licensing agency (agency) to employ all necessary employees to administer the grain buyer and warehouse laws. Defines "daily position record", "grain coproducts", and "seed inventory". Amends the definition of "grain assets". Changes the organization that administers the series 3 examination. Provides that an entity associated with a person with a revoked or suspended license may not operate as a grain buyer or warehouse. Adds seed inventory to the list of a warehouse's or grain buyer's (licensee's) unencumbered assets. Increases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Public Law 60 |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 277: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senators Messmer, Tomes, Arnold added as cosponsorss |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senator Steele added as third sponsor |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second sponsor |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-09 | House | Senator Leising added as sponsor |
2015-02-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | Amendment #1 (Lehe) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-05 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | Representative Baird added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-01-20 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Niezgodski and Friend |
2015-01-20 | House | Authored by Representative Lehe |