IN HB1544 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-06 - Senator Breaux removed as cosponsor
Pending: Senate Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-06 - Senator Breaux removed as cosponsor
Pending: Senate Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Mixed beverages. Adds a definition of "mixed beverage". Allows the holder of a wine wholesaler's permit to take certain actions concerning mixed beverages and flavored malt beverages. Provides that a wine wholesaler may possess, transport, sell, and deliver mixed beverages to person who holds a particular permit. Repeals a provision concerning a wine wholesaler that also holds a liquor permit.
Title
Mixed beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senator Breaux removed as cosponsor |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as cosponsor |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senator Busch added as cosponsor |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as cosponsor |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senator Becker added as third sponsor |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senators Walker K and Niezgodski added as cosponsors |
2023-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-06 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 77, nays 21 |
2023-02-06 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Alting |
2023-02-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-19 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2023-01-19 | House | Authored by Representative Jeter |
2023-01-19 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Soliday, Steuerwald, Moed |
Subjects
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES, Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES, Licenses, Permits, and Taxes
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES, Licenses, Permits, and Taxes