IN HB1536 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of child services. Provides that if the governor declares a state of disaster emergency, the department of child services (department) may: (1) allow older youth who are receiving collaborative care services at the time of the declaration to continue to receive collaborative care services for the duration of the state of disaster emergency; and (2) modify or suspend enforcement of a statute or rule specifying a time within which a foster parent must provide for a child to be examined by a physician, physician assistant, or advanced practice registered nurse after the child's placement in the foster parent's home.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of child services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 214
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 402: yeas 89, nays 2
2021-04-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-30SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-30SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-29SenateSenator Houchin added as third sponsor
2021-03-29SenateSenator Qaddoura added as second sponsor
2021-03-29SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-03-25SenateAmendment #1 (Grooms) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-25SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-22SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2021-02-16HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-15HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Grooms
2021-02-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 91, nays 0
2021-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Young J, Vermilion, Rowray
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative DeVon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1536/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/8/6/32868b93/HB1536.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/a/f/70afc1db/HB1536.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/d/8/ced84914/HB1536.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/0/6/7e069aa0/HB1536.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/a/3/51a33952/HB1536.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/0/4/f504f3a5/HB1536.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/6/e/dd6e54fa/HB1536.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/0/9/a209ff73/HB1536.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/3/f/ba3f957f/HB1536.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/f/a/35fadd19/HB1536.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/c/1/68c17b58/HB1536.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/d/4/5cd49a20/HB1536.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/3/6/3e3696b7/HB1536.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/b/6/85b63afa/HB1536.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/6/6/8166b35e/HB1536.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/8/6/ca8602cb/HB1536.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/7/c/c47c8c4d/HB1536.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/2/d/692d2a8a/HB1536.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/e/e/38eefc67/HB1536.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/b/7/6ab72da3/HB1536.04.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/8/3/7c83dda6/HB1536.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/5/3/4e5336a3/HB1536.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/0/1/9c01c2ed/HB1536.126_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/d/3/d5d36466/HB1536.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/8/b/2a8be0c8/HB1536.282_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/f/c/f2fc3c22/HB1536.402_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback