IN HB1536 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Solid waste management districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste management districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 116
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 505: yeas 90, nays 0
2013-03-12SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-03-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 265: yeas 48 and nays 0
2013-03-11SenateSenator Leising added as second sponsor
2013-03-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-04SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2013-03-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2013-02-19HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
2013-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 167: yeas 88, nays 2
2013-02-18HouseRepresentative Bauer added as coauthor
2013-02-18HouseAmendment 1 (Wolkins), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2013-01-22HouseCoauthored by Representative Moed
2013-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Wolkins

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback