IN HB1524 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Synthetic drugs.
Title
Synthetic drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2013-02-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Merritt and Walker |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment 1 (M. Smith), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-19 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-28 | House | Representative Austin added as coauthor |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2013-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative Davisson |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative M. Smith |