IN HB1511 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 240
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 240
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education scholarships, grants, and cost exemptions. Provides that money in the National Guard tuition supplement program fund and the National Guard scholarship extension fund may not be expended, removed, or transferred from the respective fund except to be used for the purposes of the respective fund. Provides that an eligible applicant for: (1) a scholarship under the National Guard tuition supplement program; or (2) an educational cost exemption or award; may apply for a scholarship, exemption, or award to attend a state educational institution or an approved postsecondary educational institution under certain conditions.
Title
Higher education scholarships, grants, and cost exemptions.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Christopher Judy [R] | Rep. Mike Andrade [D] | Rep. Timothy O'Brien [R] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 240 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 538: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2023-04-27 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-26 | House | Representative Judy added as conferee |
2023-04-26 | House | Representative Speedy removed as conferee |
2023-04-26 | House | Representative Judy removed as advisor |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Hunley and Garten |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Rogers and Yoder |
2023-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: Judy, O'Brien and Klinker |
2023-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Speedy and Pfaff |
2023-04-13 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2023-04-13 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 377: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2023-02-27 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Rogers and Garten |
2023-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-21 | House | Representative O'Brien T added as coauthor |
2023-02-21 | House | Representative Andrade M added as coauthor |
2023-02-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-07 | House | Representative Judy added as coauthor |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Speedy |