IN HB1502 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the legislative council to assign the topics of: (1) unlawful ingestion of controlled substances by pregnant women; (2) substance abuse by men; and (3) whether the penalty for unlawful use of a controlled substance should be based on the amount of active ingredient contained in the controlled substance; to an interim or a statutory study committee for study during the 2011 legislative interim.
Title
Substance abuse study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 134 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-27 | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 686: yeas 91, nays 0 | |
2011-04-25 | Senate advisors appointed: Head and Hume | |
2011-04-25 | Senate conferees appointed: Delph and Breaux | |
2011-04-25 | House advisors appointed: Steuerwald, Heaton and Pierce | |
2011-04-25 | House conferees appointed: Bacon and Riecken | |
2011-04-25 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 441: yeas 48 and nays 2 | |
2011-04-19 | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-19 | Amendment 3 (Breaux), prevailed; | |
2011-04-19 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment 1 (Breaux), withdrawn | |
2011-04-15 | Second reading: call withdrawn | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2011-03-28 | Senate sponsors: Senators Delph and Banks | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 99, nays 0 | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | |
2011-01-20 | Coauthored by Representatives Heaton, Riecken and McNamara | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative Bacon |