IN HB1483 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various education issues. Adds "school psychologist" to the definition of "teacher" for the purposes of teacher preparation and licensing. Requires an election for a student to have legal settlement in the school corporation whose attendance area contains the residence of the student's mother or father to be made on a yearly basis and apply throughout the school year unless the student's parent no longer resides within the attendance area of the school corporation. Provides that the visual acuity required of a school bus driver is not required of a school bus monitor. Provides that an accredited school may not offer,

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various education issues. Adds "school psychologist" to the definition of "teacher" for the purposes of teacher preparation and licensing. Requires an election for a student to have legal settlement in the school corporation whose attendance area contains the residence of the student's mother or father to be made on a yearly basis and apply throughout the school year unless the student's parent no longer resides within the attendance area of the school corporation. Provides that the visual acuity required of a school bus driver is not required of a school bus monitor. Provides that an accredited school may not offer,

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07HousePublic Law 219
2015-05-07HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 565: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-04-29HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 585: yeas 83, nays 2
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Schneider, Stoops and Yoder
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Kruse and Rogers
2015-04-20HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Behning, Cook, McNamara, Austin, Errington and Moed
2015-04-20HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Thompson and Smith V
2015-04-16HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2015-04-16HouseMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-16SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2015-04-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 467: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-04-14SenateAmendment #1 (Smith J) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
2015-02-12HouseSenator Schneider added as second sponsor
2015-02-12HouseSenator Kruse added as sponsor
2015-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 95, nays 2
2015-02-12HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-10HouseAmendment #6 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-10HouseAmendment #10 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-10HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-01-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Thompson

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1483/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/4/8/ce48df6c/HB1483.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/6/7/ea6711f4/HB1483.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/3/6/ac366d0e/HB1483.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/3/d/f83de9aa/HB1483.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/1/9/6219718b/HB1483.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/4/7/6247e593/HB1483.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/d/8/f9d8422a/HB1483.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/4/3/0f430a0b/HB1483.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/c/f/50cf2d3a/HB1483.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/d/9/b2d94967/HB1483.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/0/5/c605c5c0/HB1483.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/d/8/f0d8ce4d/HB1483.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/d/e/40debe99/HB1483.127.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/e/8/8ae80036/HB1483.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/b/d/edbdfb70/HB1483.467.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/d/3/e1d33925/HB1483.585.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/8/5/b785135e/HB1483.565.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback