IN HB1472 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vote centers. Provides that the adoption, rescission, or amendment of a vote center plan may be taken by a majority vote of all members of a county election board. (Current law requires such action to be taken by the unanimous vote of a county election board.) Provides that if all of the members of a county election board do not agree on the location of the vote centers, each member of the county election board (or board of elections and registration) is entitled to designate an equal number of locations of the vote centers. Urges the legislative council to establish
Title
Vote centers. Provides that the adoption, rescission, or amendment of a vote center plan may be taken by a majority vote of all members of a county election board. (Current law requires such action to be taken by the unanimous vote of a county election board.) Provides that if all of the members of a county election board do not agree on the location of the vote centers, each member of the county election board (or board of elections and registration) is entitled to designate an equal number of locations of the vote centers. Urges the legislative council to establish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 53 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Bartlett) prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Bartlett) prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Walker |
2017-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 53, nays 40 |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment #4 (Moseley) failed; voice vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment #6 (Moseley) failed; voice vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment #7 (Moseley) failed; voice vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment #5 (Moseley) failed; voice vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment #3 (Bartlett) motion withdrawn |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment #2 (Bartlett) prevailed; Roll Call 162: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment #1 (Hatfield) ruled out of order |
2017-02-21 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-09 | House | Representative Soliday added as coauthor |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Wesco |