IN HB1471 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
IN211 program. Transfers from the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to the housing and community development authority (authority) the responsibility for administering the statute concerning the administration of the 211 dialing code used to provide access to human services information and referrals. For purposes of the statute, expands the definition of "human services" to include assistance concerning: (1) emotional and physical abuse (including sexual assault); (2) specified public health issues; (3) food programs and nutrition education; (4) safe and affordable housing; (5) occupational and vocational training; and (6) reentry programs for persons leaving certain facilities. Caps the amount that the authority
Title
IN211 program. Transfers from the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to the housing and community development authority (authority) the responsibility for administering the statute concerning the administration of the 211 dialing code used to provide access to human services information and referrals. For purposes of the statute, expands the definition of "human services" to include assistance concerning: (1) emotional and physical abuse (including sexual assault); (2) specified public health issues; (3) food programs and nutrition education; (4) safe and affordable housing; (5) occupational and vocational training; and (6) reentry programs for persons leaving certain facilities. Caps the amount that the authority
Sponsors
Rep. Sally Siegrist [R] | Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Dave Heine [R] | Rep. Earl Harris [D] |
Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Public Law 156 |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 439: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 380: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Head and Bohacek |
2017-02-07 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-01-18 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Sullivan, Heine and Harris |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Siegrist |