IN HB1457 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Energy and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Energy and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the environmental quality service council ("council") to study the topic of clean energy improvement financing districts during the 2011 legislative interim. Requires the council to study and make recommendations concerning subordination of interests of lienholders.
Title
Clean energy improvement financing district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-28 | Senate sponsor: Senator Zakas | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 98, nays 0 | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-25 | Representative Sullivan added as coauthor | |
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative Neese |