IN HB1448 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Referred to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Adoption. Removes certain state residency requirements for individuals seeking to adopt a child. Allows a petition for adoption to be filed with the clerk of a court having probate jurisdiction in a county where an attorney maintains an office. Provides that the issuance of a required notice for an original petition for adoption satisfies the notice requirement for any second or amended petition concerning the adoption. Requires notice of an adoption petition to be delivered to imprisoned or detained individuals. Specifies certain requirements when delivering notice of a petition for adoption to an individual whose address is unknown. Provides that certain notice requirements concerning petitions for adoption are met even when the recipient of the notice refuses to accept the offer or tender of the notice. Specifies certain other requirements concerning notice for petitions for adoption. Removes and amends certain provisions that require service of a notice concerning an adoption to be performed in accordance with certain Indiana trial rules. Requires a putative father to register with specified putative father registries in order to be entitled to a notice concerning the adoption of the putative father's child. Provides that once a petitioner for adoption presents clear and convincing evidence of a parent's failure to communicate with or support a child for one year, the parent has the burden of proving justifiable cause for the parent's failure to communicate with or support the child. Prohibits a court from considering the: (1) parent's substance abuse; (2) parent's voluntary unemployment; and (3) instability of a parent's household caused by a family or household member of the parent; when evaluating justifiable cause for a parent's abandonment or desertion of a child or a parent's failure to communicate with or support a child. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseCosponsor: Senator Randolph
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Brown L, Koch, Busch
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 212: yeas 96, nays 0
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-15HouseRepresentative Carbaugh added as coauthor
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Torr

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1448/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/3/4/2f349af2/HB1448.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/6/8/a168e385/HB1448.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/c/5/43c58f32/HB1448.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/b/3/42b39147/HB1448.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/1/6/6116f1ad/HB1448.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/9/6/759695f7/HB1448.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/b/c/8cbced2e/HB1448.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/0/7/b2073e11/HB1448.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/6/c/9f6c3be5/HB1448.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/9/b/219b4593/HB1448.212_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback