IN HB1436 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Referred to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Administrative proceedings and state agencies. Provides that, in an adjudicative administrative proceeding concerning an agency action, the administrative law judge shall order the agency to pay the reasonable attorney's fees incurred by the party challenging the agency action if the administrative law judge makes a finding that the agency action was: (1) arbitrary, capricious, an abuse of discretion, or otherwise not in accordance with law; (2) contrary to constitutional right, power, privilege, or immunity; (3) in excess of statutory jurisdiction, authority, or limitations, or short of statutory right; (4) without observance of procedure required by law; or (5) not supported by substantial evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative proceedings and state agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Messmer
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 94, nays 0
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Thompson

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1436/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/d/8/12d8220b/HB1436.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/a/6/40a64a70/HB1436.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/f/e/91fe3da3/HB1436.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/b/9/e1b94f4e/HB1436.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/b/4/74b46a76/HB1436.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/9/f/d39fb1a3/HB1436.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/9/1/a591c929/HB1436.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/d/a/4dda7a38/HB1436.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/8/2/a38283b7/HB1436.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/6/3/6863beaf/HB1436.150_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback