IN HB1421 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Public Law 151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School discipline. Provides that the department of education's (department) model evidence based plan for improving student behavior and discipline must: (1) reduce out-of-school suspension and disproportionality in discipline and expulsion; (2) limit referrals to law enforcement or arrests on school property to cases in which referral to law enforcement or arrest is necessary to protect the health and safety of students or school employees; and (3) include policies to address instances of bullying and cyberbullying on school property of a school corporation. Provides that, beginning in the 2019-2020 school year, the department, in collaboration with parent organizations, teacher organizations, educational

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School discipline. Provides that the department of education's (department) model evidence based plan for improving student behavior and discipline must: (1) reduce out-of-school suspension and disproportionality in discipline and expulsion; (2) limit referrals to law enforcement or arrests on school property to cases in which referral to law enforcement or arrest is necessary to protect the health and safety of students or school employees; and (3) include policies to address instances of bullying and cyberbullying on school property of a school corporation. Provides that, beginning in the 2019-2020 school year, the department, in collaboration with parent organizations, teacher organizations, educational

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HousePublic Law 151
2018-03-19HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-03-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 363: yeas 80, nays 0
2018-03-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2018-03-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2018-03-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 335: yeas 46, nays 3
2018-03-05SenateAmendment #2 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote
2018-03-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-03-01SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor
2018-03-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2018-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2018-02-05HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Raatz
2018-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 148: yeas 92, nays 0
2018-02-01HouseAmendment #1 (Smith V) prevailed; voice vote
2018-02-01HouseAmendment #2 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
2018-02-01HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-01-30HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-22HouseRepresentative Porter added as coauthor
2018-01-16HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2018-01-16HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/house/1421/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/5/d/ae5dbf99/HB1421.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/3/3/94332ecb/HB1421.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/e/5/bbe52fc7/HB1421.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/9/a/939a64f5/HB1421.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/c/f/0ccf381d/HB1421.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/5/7/33578a5a/HB1421.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/f/4/58f4db3f/HB1421.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/b/9/e0b942e8/HB1421.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/4/5/d04591ff/HB1421.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/d/1/8ed17981/HB1421.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/d/d/f9dd73e8/HB1421.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/8/f/648f7f85/HB1421.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/d/1/f2d12520/HB1421.148.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/a/1/d3a1960a/HB1421.03.ENGH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/e/c/fcec7c93/HB1421.335.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/8/e/398e42e9/HB1421.363.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback