IN HB1413 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Aircraft. Removes the automatic reclassification of an aircraft in an aircraft dealer's inventory from the status of "aircraft inventory" to the status of "property of a nondealer" after 180 days. Provides that an airplane that has total time in service exceeding 50 hours in a year is no longer considered an aircraft in inventory and requires the sales and use sales tax to be paid. Provides that a dealer who has had an aircraft reclassified out of the dealer's aircraft inventory because of the 180 day provision may: (1) elect to return an aircraft to the dealer's aircraft inventory if
Title
Aircraft. Removes the automatic reclassification of an aircraft in an aircraft dealer's inventory from the status of "aircraft inventory" to the status of "property of a nondealer" after 180 days. Provides that an airplane that has total time in service exceeding 50 hours in a year is no longer considered an aircraft in inventory and requires the sales and use sales tax to be paid. Provides that a dealer who has had an aircraft reclassified out of the dealer's aircraft inventory because of the 180 day provision may: (1) elect to return an aircraft to the dealer's aircraft inventory if
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 73 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Public Law 102 |
2015-04-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 489: yeas 73, nays 12 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 382: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Zakas) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Arnold removed as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as third sponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as second sponsor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Ford added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 248: yeas 93, nays 2 |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Speedy |