IN HB1406 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a police officer employed by a college or university may exercise the officer's police power in any part of Indiana if: (1) the college or university adopts a resolution specifically describing the territorial jurisdiction of a police officer employed by the college or university; and (2) the board of trustees sends notice to the superintendent of state police and the sheriff (or in the case of a consolidated city, the chief of police) of the county in which the institution is primarily located. Requires a police officer employed by a college or university to meet the certain training requirements in order to exercise the officer's police powers. Requires a police officer employed by a college or university that exercises the officer's police powers outside of the county in which the institution is primarily located to notify the sheriff (or in a consolidated city, the chief of police) as soon as practicable.
Title
Jurisdiction of university and college police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 30 | |
2011-04-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 325: yeas 42 and nays 6 | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Senator Lanane added as cosponsor | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs | |
2011-02-15 | Senate sponsors: Senators Head and Arnold | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 179: yeas 92, nays 3 | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-08 | Representative L. Lawson added as coauthor | |
2011-02-07 | Representative Klinker added as coauthor | |
2011-02-03 | Representative Kirchhofer added as coauthor | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Representative Truitt |