IN HB1403 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Public Law 178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Regional cities. Establishes the Indiana regional city fund (fund) to provide grants and loans to regional development authorities. Provides that the Indiana economic development corporation administers the fund. Broadens the definition of "project" under the regional development authority statute to include any project that enhances a region with the goal of attracting people or business. Specifies that the board of the Indiana economic development corporation (board) may not approve an application for a grant unless: (1) the budget committee has reviewed the application; (2) the board finds that approving the application will have an overall positive return on investment for

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional cities. Establishes the Indiana regional city fund (fund) to provide grants and loans to regional development authorities. Provides that the Indiana economic development corporation administers the fund. Broadens the definition of "project" under the regional development authority statute to include any project that enhances a region with the goal of attracting people or business. Specifies that the board of the Indiana economic development corporation (board) may not approve an application for a grant unless: (1) the budget committee has reviewed the application; (2) the board finds that approving the application will have an overall positive return on investment for

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-06HousePublic Law 178
2015-05-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 555: yeas 37, nays 11
2015-04-29HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 576: yeas 86, nays 6
2015-04-21SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Mishler, Broden and Kenley
2015-04-21SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Tallian
2015-04-21HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Slager, Smaltz and Porter
2015-04-21HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Torr and Hale
2015-04-21HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2015-04-20HouseMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2015-04-09SenateSenator Alting added as cosponsor
2015-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 401: yeas 48, nays 1
2015-04-07SenateAmendment #2 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-07SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-03-30SenateSenator Mishler added as third sponsor
2015-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-26SenateSenator Broden added as cosponsor
2015-03-12SenateTallian added as cosponsor
2015-03-02SenateSenator Grooms added as second sponsor
2015-03-02SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2015-02-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-24HouseSenator Charbonneau added as sponsor
2015-02-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 247: yeas 85, nays 8
2015-02-19HouseAmendment #2 (Porter) motion withdrawn
2015-02-19HouseAmendment #1 (Torr) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-03HouseRepresentatives Hale and Slager added as coauthor
2015-01-20HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Torr

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1403/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/7/3/93736e79/HB1403.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/e/b/71eb106b/HB1403.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/4/6/58465e12/HB1403.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/b/9/44b99a68/HB1403.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/b/7/b4b7a17d/HB1403.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/8/6/95861bf1/HB1403.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/1/3/8013f262/HB1403.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/a/8/9aa87d8e/HB1403.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/c/0/67c06369/HB1403.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/6/9/51692a08/HB1403.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/3/0/993068dd/HB1403.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/9/9/4e9955aa/HB1403.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/0/2/810298ba/HB1403.247.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/5/8/4958e07a/HB1403.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/4/2/8e4223cf/HB1403.401.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/5/3/b053e0c2/HB1403.576.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/b/b/41bb4c6f/HB1403.555.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback