IN HB1402 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an individual who is not lawfully in the United States is not eligible to pay the resident tuition rate that is determined by the state educational institution.
Title
Prohibiting resident tuition for illegal aliens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Rogers), failed (Y: 7 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Rogers), failed (Y: 7 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 209 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-21 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 438: yeas 38 and nays 12 | |
2011-04-19 | Amendment 1 (Rogers), failed; Roll Call 394: yeas 15, nays 33 | |
2011-04-19 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2011-02-14 | Senate sponsor: Senator Buck | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-14 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 75, nays 14 | |
2011-02-10 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-08 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Representative Cheatham added as coauthor | |
2011-01-31 | Representative Koch added as coauthor | |
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-20 | Coauthored by Representative Turner | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |