IN HB1398 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 255
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Information concerning threats to school safety. Permits a law enforcement agency or private university police department to share private investigatory records with a school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school for the purpose of enhancing the safety of a student or school facility, without losing the discretion to keep the records confidential from other records requesters. Provides that a school corporation or other entity to which the education records privacy provisions of the federal Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act apply may disclose or report on the education records of a child, including personally identifiable information contained in the education records, without the consent of the child's parent to appropriate officials in cases of health and safety emergencies as determined by school officials. Provides immunity from civil liability concerning the disclosure or report of education records of a student. Provides that in the case of a health or safety emergency, a law enforcement officer shall disclose or report a child's personally identifiable information contained in law enforcement records to a school corporation or an appropriate official. Provides that information concerning any suspicious activity or potential criminal activity related to a child that is shared between a law enforcement officer and a school corporation or an appropriate official shall not be stored or maintained in any type of data base.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information concerning threats to school safety. Permits a law enforcement agency or private university police department to share private investigatory records with a school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school for the purpose of enhancing the safety of a student or school facility, without losing the discretion to keep the records confidential from other records requesters. Provides that a school corporation or other entity to which the education records privacy provisions of the federal Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act apply may disclose or report on the education records of a child, including personally identifiable information contained in the education records, without the consent of the child's parent to appropriate officials in cases of health and safety emergencies as determined by school officials. Provides immunity from civil liability concerning the disclosure or report of education records of a student. Provides that in the case of a health or safety emergency, a law enforcement officer shall disclose or report a child's personally identifiable information contained in law enforcement records to a school corporation or an appropriate official. Provides that information concerning any suspicious activity or potential criminal activity related to a child that is shared between a law enforcement officer and a school corporation or an appropriate official shall not be stored or maintained in any type of data base.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 255
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-22HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 564: yeas 86, nays 1
2019-04-18HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 489: yeas 39, nays 6
2019-04-15SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-15SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-15SenateSenator Doriot added as second sponsor
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 94, nays 2
2019-02-18HouseAmendment #1 (Cook) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-16HouseRepresentative McNamara added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Cherry
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1398/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/7/e/f87e6b71/HB1398.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/b/a/13ba79ea/HB1398.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/8/9/1d898ecd/HB1398.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/d/2/88d213e7/HB1398.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/4/b/8e4b1cd2/HB1398.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/d/2/e9d2adaa/HB1398.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/4/d/3e4d9df9/HB1398.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/e/4/fee4c2c1/HB1398.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/b/2/0bb28154/HB1398.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/7/3/1a732d90/HB1398.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/b/9/edb98a71/HB1398.231.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/a/c/03acb8e3/HB1398.03.ENGH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/b/d/c7bd8501/HB1398.489.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/0/0/2b0080ef/HB1398.564.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback