IN HB1397 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 254
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School corporations. Provides that before September 15 of any year, a governing body may pass a one year resolution indicating that a portion or percentage of money transferred from the operations fund to the education fund may be considered education fund revenue for purposes of determining whether a teacher collective bargaining agreement would place the employer in a position of deficit financing. Makes a technical amendment. Provides that a school corporation shall submit a copy of the resolution to the department of local government finance on or before November 1. Provides that the resolution shall include: (1) all transfers between the operations fund and the education fund; and (2) a statement regarding whether or not the transfer is for the purpose of funding teacher contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School corporations. Provides that before September 15 of any year, a governing body may pass a one year resolution indicating that a portion or percentage of money transferred from the operations fund to the education fund may be considered education fund revenue for purposes of determining whether a teacher collective bargaining agreement would place the employer in a position of deficit financing. Makes a technical amendment. Provides that a school corporation shall submit a copy of the resolution to the department of local government finance on or before November 1. Provides that the resolution shall include: (1) all transfers between the operations fund and the education fund; and (2) a statement regarding whether or not the transfer is for the purpose of funding teacher contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 254
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 466: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-04-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 309: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-03-21SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-18SenateSenator Raatz added as second sponsor
2019-03-18SenateSenator Spartz added as sponsor
2019-03-18SenateSenator Raatz removed as sponsor
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-21HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor
2019-02-21HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Spartz and Bassler
2019-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 98, nays 0
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-16HouseRepresentative McNamara added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Cherry
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1397/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/c/d/cccd5db2/HB1397.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/1/b/331b415f/HB1397.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/d/0/b0d0ce77/HB1397.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/7/7/0a77c447/HB1397.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/5/f/b75fd593/HB1397.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/3/7/e4373027/HB1397.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/2/9/a72992d4/HB1397.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/0/6/1606e830/HB1397.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/1/6/ff16662f/HB1397.255.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/b/1/10b1c2f4/HB1397.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/1/f/711fcba1/HB1397.309.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/4/e/d54e7b9f/HB1397.466.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback