IN HB1396 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher licensing for military spouses. Requires the state board of education to adopt rules, including emergency rules, that establish procedures to expedite the issuance, renewal, or reinstatement of a teacher license to a military spouse whose husband or wife is assigned to a duty station in Indiana. (Current law allows, but does not require, the state board to adopt such rules.)
Title
Teacher licensing for military spouses. Requires the state board of education to adopt rules, including emergency rules, that establish procedures to expedite the issuance, renewal, or reinstatement of a teacher license to a military spouse whose husband or wife is assigned to a duty station in Indiana. (Current law allows, but does not require, the state board to adopt such rules.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Public Law 20 |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senators Tomes and Crane added as cosponsors |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senator Glick added as third sponsor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Kenley and Raatz |
2017-02-07 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-31 | House | Representatives Arnold, Cook, Austin added as coauthors |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara |