IN HB1394 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 223
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Waiver of local occupational license fees. Requires a unit (county, city, town, or township) to waive as applicable all or part of the occupational and professional license fees and taxes imposed by the unit for the initial issuance and reinstatement of an occupational or professional license for applicants who are veterans, on active duty with the military or national guard, or indigent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waiver of local occupational license fees. Requires a unit (county, city, town, or township) to waive as applicable all or part of the occupational and professional license fees and taxes imposed by the unit for the initial issuance and reinstatement of an occupational or professional license for applicants who are veterans, on active duty with the military or national guard, or indigent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HousePublic Law 223
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-21HouseHouse reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 538: yeas 98, nays 0
2017-04-21HouseMotion to concur filed
2017-04-10HouseHouse advisors appointed: Carbaugh and Taylor J
2017-04-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: Boots and Tallian
2017-04-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Frizzell and Moseley
2017-04-10SenateSenate conferees appointed: Young M and Niezgodski
2017-04-06HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-06HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-05SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-04SenateSenator Delph added as cosponsor
2017-04-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 375: yeas 37, nays 11
2017-04-03SenateAmendment #3 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-30SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-28SenateSenator Boots added as second sponsor
2017-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-27HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Young M
2017-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 93, nays 0
2017-02-23HouseAmendment #1 (Carbaugh) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-23HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-21HouseRepresentatives Taylor J and Carbaugh added as coauthors
2017-02-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2017-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Frizzell

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1394/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/0/b/3f0b5610/HB1394.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/1/1/fd111b3e/HB1394.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/c/e/bece400c/HB1394.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/5/e/7a5eacc5/HB1394.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/0/f/540ff3d0/HB1394.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/c/3/abc315aa/HB1394.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/e/0/e1e01f7a/HB1394.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/4/8/fc481901/HB1394.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/3/f/443f5891/HB1394.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/7/5/4f75a19c/HB1394.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/e/c/6dec376b/HB1394.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/0/5/2a05c67c/HB1394.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/f/e/d8fe9a02/HB1394.233.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/d/2/28d2bcbe/HB1394.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/4/2/ef42d2f7/HB1394.375.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/d/2/c2d2c93b/HB1394.538.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback