IN HB1392 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 131
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Physician assistants and nurses. Beginning January 1, 2021, allows a physician assistant who: (1) performs under a collaborative agreement that allows the physician assistant to certify the cause of death and submit death records as delegated by the collaborating physician; and (2) is last in attendance upon the deceased; and (3) certifies the cause of death of a deceased individual; to enter or sign a record on a death into the Indiana death registration system. Beginning January 1, 2021, allows an advanced practice registered nurse who is last in attendance upon the deceased to certify the cause of death of a deceased individual and to enter or sign a record on a death into the Indiana death registration system. Provides that one of the registered nurses appointed to the Indiana state board of nursing (board) must be an advanced practice registered nurse who has, or has had, prescriptive authority. Amends the qualifications of registered nurse members and practical nurse members of the board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician assistants and nurses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 131
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 336: yeas 79, nays 0
2020-03-05HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenators Leising, Buck, Rogers added as cosponsors
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 318: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-18SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateSenator Melton added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-02-04HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-02-03HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Busch
2020-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 92, nays 0
2020-01-30HouseRepresentative Jackson added as coauthor
2020-01-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-27HouseRepresentative Mayfield added as coauthor
2020-01-15HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Smaltz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1392/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/b/7/38b7f2a8/HB1392.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/4/5/834522c5/HB1392.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/9/2/4a929895/HB1392.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/6/f/376f936c/HB1392.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/2/7/c427fbcb/HB1392.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/e/d/35ed5dd5/HB1392.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/7/d/607dc0cf/HB1392.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/6/8/5a689cb8/HB1392.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/7/7/b7778672/HB1392.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/f/7/a1f7dfa1/HB1392.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/e/2/66e23cbd/HB1392.170_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/b/f/a4bf1087/HB1392.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/7/c/f77cca9a/HB1392.318_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/b/0/75b00b36/HB1392.336_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback