IN HB1386 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various alcohol, tobacco, and e-liquid matters. Allows, if certain conditions are met, the holder of a retailer permit that is issued for the premises of a hotel that is owned by an accredited college or university to sell or dispense, for on premise consumption only, alcoholic beverages from a: (1) nonpermanent bar that is located on; or (2) service window located on the licensed premises that opens to; an outside area or terrace that is contiguous to the main building of the licensed premises of the hotel. Allows the refilling of a bottle or container with a product from a

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various alcohol, tobacco, and e-liquid matters. Allows, if certain conditions are met, the holder of a retailer permit that is issued for the premises of a hotel that is owned by an accredited college or university to sell or dispense, for on premise consumption only, alcoholic beverages from a: (1) nonpermanent bar that is located on; or (2) service window located on the licensed premises that opens to; an outside area or terrace that is contiguous to the main building of the licensed premises of the hotel. Allows the refilling of a bottle or container with a product from a

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-07 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Boots) failed (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 214
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2016-03-10SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2016-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 391: yeas 63, nays 30
2016-03-07HouseMotion to concur filed
2016-03-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 309: yeas 33, nays 17
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #3 (Becker) failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 17, nays 29
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #2 (Boots) failed; Roll Call 238: yeas 19, nays 31
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #6 (Alting) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-25HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2016-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-02HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Alting and Arnold
2016-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 86, nays 10
2016-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2016-01-13HouseCoauthored by Representative GiaQuinta
2016-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Dermody

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1386/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/3/5/463535cf/HB1386.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/a/e/8aae0946/HB1386.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/d/1/4bd1e128/HB1386.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/4/d/b64db9fc/HB1386.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/c/5/b7c59b7c/HB1386.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/6/2/cc62752a/HB1386.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/e/d/51ed8a6e/HB1386.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/e/e/e3eecaaf/HB1386.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/d/9/37d982eb/HB1386.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/5/2/5e526191/HB1386.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/6/0/2c6087b7/HB1386.159.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/1/8/2218179c/HB1386.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/3/b/313bd83d/HB1386.238.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/c/8/dbc82a72/HB1386.309.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/c/f/d3cf4f1c/HB1386.391.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback