IN HB1384 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Chiropractors. Amends the definition of "chiropractic". Removes certain acts that a chiropractor is prohibited from practicing. Provides that the board may adopt rules establishing health and sanitation standards for dry needling. Provides that accreditation of a chiropractic college for licensure purposes may be by a successor organization of the Accreditation Commission of the Council on Chiropractic Education. Requires that an applicant for a license to practice chiropractic must complete at least 90 semester hours of education after June 30, 2021. Prohibits an individual from using the title "chiropractor" unless the individual is a licensed chiropractor. Allows a chiropractor to perform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chiropractors. Amends the definition of "chiropractic". Removes certain acts that a chiropractor is prohibited from practicing. Provides that the board may adopt rules establishing health and sanitation standards for dry needling. Provides that accreditation of a chiropractic college for licensure purposes may be by a successor organization of the Accreditation Commission of the Council on Chiropractic Education. Requires that an applicant for a license to practice chiropractic must complete at least 90 semester hours of education after June 30, 2021. Prohibits an individual from using the title "chiropractor" unless the individual is a licensed chiropractor. Allows a chiropractor to perform

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14HousePublic Law 85
2018-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-03-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-07SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-07HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 336: yeas 79, nays 17
2018-03-05HouseMotion to concur filed
2018-02-27SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2018-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 48, nays 0
2018-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2018-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-02-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-13SenateSenators Alting, Bassler, Becker, Doriot, Koch, Perfect, Tomes added as cosponsors
2018-02-13SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2018-02-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2018-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2018-01-30HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2018-01-29HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Messmer
2018-01-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 67: yeas 85, nays 10
2018-01-25HouseAmendment #1 (Beumer) prevailed; voice vote
2018-01-25HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-16HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2018-01-16HouseCoauthored by Representatives VanNatter and Shackleford
2018-01-16HouseAuthored by Representative Beumer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/house/1384/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/e/c/f4ecc683/HB1384.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/2/7/d82700b1/HB1384.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/8/0/78805515/HB1384.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/6/5/3f65e65d/HB1384.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/b/1/1eb1b27e/HB1384.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/f/8/71f8b1b7/HB1384.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/b/8/13b898a7/HB1384.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/6/b/986bd8ba/HB1384.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/c/0/b2c0d1c7/HB1384.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/7/4/bc745e99/HB1384.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/b/9/40b93275/HB1384.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/e/9/76e99798/HB1384.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/d/8/0ed81da6/HB1384.67.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/1/b/aa1bcea3/HB1384.03.ENGH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/a/5/79a5366f/HB1384.239.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/d/3/27d3d4c9/HB1384.336.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback