IN HB1376 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-18 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-18 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes all township boards on January 1, 2012. Specifies that after December 31, 2011, in each county: (1) the county fiscal body is the fiscal body and legislative body of each township in the county; and (2) the county fiscal body shall exercise the legislative and fiscal powers assigned in the Indiana Code to township boards, including the authority to adopt the township's annual budget and to levy township property taxes for township funds. Repeals statutes related to township boards. Provides that on January 1, 2012, the remaining township fire departments in Marion County are consolidated into the fire department of the consolidated city. Provides that in a county that: (1) contains a consolidated city; or (2) contains a second class city; township government is abolished on the earlier of: (1) January 1, 2015; or (2) the date established by resolution of the township board (before January 1, 2012) or the county fiscal body (after December 31, 2011) and approved by order of the township trustee; and township powers and duties are transferred to the county. Provides that in counties not containing a consolidated city or a second class city a public question shall be placed on the November 2012 general election ballot in the county regarding whether the voters want to retain township
Title
Local government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Representative Hinkle |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1376 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN1376.1.html |