IN HB1372 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public personnel bonds and state board of accounts. Amends the law requiring surety bonds for certain individuals having public fiscal responsibilities to: (1) define "contractor"; (2) allow for filing of the bond in the county of office or employment rather than residence; (3) set threshold amounts of public funds for which a bond is required; (4) permit the use of a schedule bond; (5) permit the use of a continuous bond; and (6) require a crime insurance policy that meets the requirement to include a faithful performance endorsement. Allows, rather than requires, the commissioner of insurance to prescribe the form
Title
Public personnel bonds and state board of accounts. Amends the law requiring surety bonds for certain individuals having public fiscal responsibilities to: (1) define "contractor"; (2) allow for filing of the bond in the county of office or employment rather than residence; (3) set threshold amounts of public funds for which a bond is required; (4) permit the use of a schedule bond; (5) permit the use of a continuous bond; and (6) require a crime insurance policy that meets the requirement to include a faithful performance endorsement. Allows, rather than requires, the commissioner of insurance to prescribe the form
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Randy Truitt [R] | Rep. Gail Riecken [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Public Law 188 |
2016-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 396: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-09 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 424: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Buck, Tallian and Raatz |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Taylor |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Miller D, Cox and Pryor |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Lehman and Riecken |
2016-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second sponsor |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-26 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2016-01-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2016-01-12 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Truitt and Riecken |
2016-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |