IN HB1369 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms matters. Effective March 30, 2022: (1) Repeals the law that requires a person to obtain a license to carry a handgun in Indiana; (2) Specifies that certain persons who are not otherwise prohibited from carrying or possessing a handgun are not required to obtain or possess a license or permit from the state to carry a handgun in Indiana; (3) Prohibits certain individuals from knowingly or intentionally carrying a handgun; (4) Creates the crime of "unlawful carrying of a handgun"; (5) Provides that a prohibited person who knowingly or intentionally carries a handgun commits a Class A misdemeanor; (6) Specifies that the unlawful carrying of a handgun is a Level 5 felony if a person: (A) is less than 23 years of age; and (B) has an adjudication as a delinquent child for an act described by IC 35-47-4-5 (unlawful possession of a firearm by a serious violent felon); (7) Allows a resident of Indiana who wishes to carry a firearm in another state under a reciprocity agreement entered into by Indiana and the other state to obtain from the superintendent of the state police department a reciprocity license; (8) Requires law enforcement agencies to make use of certain data bases when issuing reciprocity licenses; (9) Specifies the following fees for reciprocity licenses: (A) $0 for five year reciprocity licenses, and (B) $75 for lifetime reciprocity licenses; (10) Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally exerts unauthorized control over a firearm of another person with the intent to deprive the person of any part of its value or use commits theft, a Level 5 felony; and (11) Allows for the imposition of an additional fixed term of imprisonment when a person knowingly or intentionally: (A) points; or (B) discharges; a firearm at someone the person knew, or reasonably should have known, was a first responder. Effective July 1, 2021: (1) Provides that the following must develop a process that allows law enforcement officers the ability to quickly access information about whether a person is a prohibited person who may not knowingly or intentionally carry a handgun: (A) The state police department; (B) The bureau of motor vehicles; (C) Local law enforcement agencies; and (D) Any other state entity with access to information related to persons who may not knowingly or intentionally carry a handgun; (2) Provides that the information made available to law enforcement officers must meet all state and federal statutory, constitutional, and regulatory requirements; and (3) Allows state entities to enter into a memorandum of understanding to ensure that all legal requirements are met. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Amendment #4 () failed (Y: 2 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Amendment #5 () failed (Y: 11 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2021-04-01SenateSenators Niemeyer, Donato, Baldwin added as cosponsors
2021-04-01SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2021-04-01SenateSenators Ford Jon, Boots, Zay added as cosponsors
2021-03-30SenateSenator Young M added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateSenator Glick added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateSenators Doriot, Leising, Gaskill added as cosponsors
2021-03-30SenateSenator Crane added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2021-03-11SenateSenator Tomes added as cosponsor
2021-03-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseCosponsors: Senators Freeman and Garten
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Houchin, Messmer, Koch
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 65, nays 31
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #7 (Jacob) failed; voice vote
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #4 (Jacob) failed; Roll Call 200: yeas 2, nays 92
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #5 (Jacob) failed; Roll Call 199: yeas 11, nays 82
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-16HouseRepresentative Lucas added as coauthor
2021-02-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-15HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2021-02-15HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Lehman and Wesco
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Smaltz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1369/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/c/a/cbca24d4/HB1369.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/d/d/bcddda24/HB1369.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/7/5/5d755703/HB1369.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/4/0/fe408bb4/HB1369.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/2/d/942deff2/HB1369.03.COMH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/0/9/4e09e86d/HB1369.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/b/6/b9b67381/HB1369.03.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/1/2/cc12d8ff/HB1369.03.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/5/2/3952c0d1/HB1369.03.COMH.AMH004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/e/a/7eea3bf9/HB1369.03.COMH.AMH005.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/7/4/2f74083d/HB1369.03.COMH.AMH006.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/9/a/b09a1906/HB1369.03.COMH.AMH007.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/1/2/ca129466/HB1369.03.COMH.AMH008.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/d/8/41d8342d/HB1369.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/6/5/1465b797/HB1369.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/3/e/2d3e52bb/HB1369.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/d/e/56dea650/HB1369.02.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/a/4/f2a42dac/HB1369.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/d/f/67df6981/HB1369.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/e/9/a4e91ac2/HB1369.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/a/f/71af603e/HB1369.03.COMH.FN004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/1/9/1919341d/HB1369.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/8/a/668a71ed/HB1369.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/8/8/61889e65/HB1369.199_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/0/f/d00fedca/HB1369.200_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/4/7/71476660/HB1369.217_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback