IN HB1362 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

License plate life cycle. Provides that the cycle for issuance and replacement of certain license plates is not less than five years and not more than 10 years. (Current law requires a five year cycle for the license plates.) Makes a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License plate life cycle. Provides that the cycle for issuance and replacement of certain license plates is not less than five years and not more than 10 years. (Current law requires a five year cycle for the license plates.) Makes a technical correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Forestal) failed (Y: 29 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Forestal) failed (Y: 30 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15HousePublic Law 26
2015-04-15HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-07SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-03-17SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2015-03-16SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2015-03-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 291: yeas 48, nays 1
2015-03-12SenateStoops added as cosponsor
2015-03-12SenateSenator Crider added as second sponsor
2015-03-12SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-10SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation
2015-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-01-27HouseRepresentatives Brown, C., Morris, Pryor added as coauthorss
2015-01-27HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-01-27HouseSenator Yoder added first sponsor
2015-01-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 97, nays 0
2015-01-26HouseAmendment #2 (Forestal) failed; Roll Call 18: yeas 29, nays 68
2015-01-26HouseAmendment #1 (Forestal) failed; Roll Call 17: yeas 29, nays 68
2015-01-26HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-22HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2015-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Soliday
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Sullivan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1362/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/e/7/87e7338d/HB1362.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/d/7/91d7ea6d/HB1362.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/8/f/ff8f4d1d/HB1362.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/7/6/6b762d20/HB1362.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/0/e/150eb227/HB1362.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/c/0/12c00d3c/HB1362.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/5/4/ca548baf/HB1362.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/9/9/b399926d/HB1362.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/3/0/7a30f798/HB1362.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/b/6/d8b612f1/HB1362.291.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/4/3/4b43ee75/HB1362.17.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/0/9/0f097f74/HB1362.18.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/d/d/fadd1841/HB1362.42.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback