IN HB1360 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Senator Alting added as second sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Senator Alting added as second sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Massage therapists. Provides that massage therapists are governed by the health professions standards of practice. (Under current law, massage therapists are governed by the professional licensing standards of practice.)
Title
Massage therapists. Provides that massage therapists are governed by the health professions standards of practice. (Under current law, massage therapists are governed by the professional licensing standards of practice.)
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Errington [D] | Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] |
Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Alting added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Senator Miller, Pat added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 114: yeas 71, nays 25 |
2015-02-05 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-02 | House | Representatives Bacon and Zent added as coauthor |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2015-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Frizzell |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Errington |