IN HB1360 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a process for approval of an entity that is approved by a national accrediting body to provide certain services under home and community based services waivers. Requires the Indiana Donation Alliance Foundation and Donate Life Indiana to submit an annual audited report concerning the anatomical gift promotion fund (fund) to the: (1) speaker of the house of representatives; (2) president pro tempore of the senate; (3) senate health and provider services committee; and (4) house of representatives public health committee; before February 1. Provides that money in the fund may not be distributed for any quarter of a year until the report for the previous year has been submitted. Requires that any annual reports that were not submitted before March 15, 2011, must be submitted by August 1, 2012. Extends the expiration date of the fund from July 1, 2012, to July 1, 2014. Exempts the health and hospital corporation from following certain procedures in the sale, lease, or disposal of property. (Current law exempts the health and hospital corporation from following these procedures in the disposal of surplus property.) Adds the violations of failing to disclose, or negligently omitting, documentation requested for license renewal to the list of violations for which the medical licensing board of Indiana may investigate and assess a civil penalty against a physician.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-09 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 358: yeas 46, nays 3
2012-03-09 Senate Rule 86(a) suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 398: yeas 96, nays 0
2012-03-09 Rules suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-05 Senate advisor appointed: Becker and Rogers
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Miller and Breaux
2012-03-01 House advisors appointed: T. Brown, Davisson, Grubb and Battles
2012-03-01 House conferees appointed: Bacon and Welch
2012-03-01 House dissented from Senate amendments
2012-02-20 Returned to the House with amendments
2012-02-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 211: yeas 50 and nays 0
2012-02-13 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-09 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2012-01-30 Senate sponsors: Senators Miller and Breaux
2012-01-30 Referred to the Senate
2012-01-30 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 93, nays 0
2012-01-27 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-26 Representative Bacon added as coauthor
2012-01-25 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2012-01-11 Coauthored by Representative Grubb
2012-01-11 Authored by Representative Welch

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback