IN HB1354 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sickle cell disease grant program. Requires the state department of health (state department) to do the following concerning the sickle cell disease program (program): (1) Develop standards for determining eligibility for individuals requesting care and treatment for sickle cell disease. (2) Assist in the development and expansion of care for the treatment of individuals with sickle cell disease. (3) Provide financial assistance to individuals with sickle cell disease for specified treatments. Specifies that in awarding grants under the program, the state department shall give priority to establishing sickle cell disease centers in underserved areas with a higher population of individuals with sickle cell disease. Specifies program requirements. Establishes the sickle cell chronic disease fund for purposes of funding the program. Requires the state department, with the assistance of specified groups, to prepare a biennial study of information concerning sickle cell disease in Indiana. Requires the study to be transmitted to the general assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sickle cell disease grant program. Requires the state department of health (state department) to do the following concerning the sickle cell disease program (program): (1) Develop standards for determining eligibility for individuals requesting care and treatment for sickle cell disease. (2) Assist in the development and expansion of care for the treatment of individuals with sickle cell disease. (3) Provide financial assistance to individuals with sickle cell disease for specified treatments. Specifies that in awarding grants under the program, the state department shall give priority to establishing sickle cell disease centers in underserved areas with a higher population of individuals with sickle cell disease. Specifies program requirements. Establishes the sickle cell chronic disease fund for purposes of funding the program. Requires the state department, with the assistance of specified groups, to prepare a biennial study of information concerning sickle cell disease in Indiana. Requires the study to be transmitted to the general assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HousePublic Law 55
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-28SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-03-26SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 330: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-18HouseCosponsor: Senator Melton
2019-02-18HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau, Breaux and Becker
2019-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 193: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-04HouseRepresentative Huston added as coauthor
2019-01-31HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-01-31HouseRepresentative Kirchhofer added as coauthor
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Shackleford
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Porter

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1354/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/0/2/08023a66/HB1354.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/4/6/3b467977/HB1354.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/4/2/944251ae/HB1354.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/9/6/2a966b9a/HB1354.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/a/a/adaa9da6/HB1354.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/5/e/825e74d7/HB1354.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/d/1/b3d13f16/HB1354.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/4/b/994bff2b/HB1354.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/a/4/0da4a598/HB1354.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/1/4/3714432f/HB1354.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/f/3/18f36d81/HB1354.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/d/e/87de21d4/HB1354.193.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/d/7/8dd70d69/HB1354.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/e/c/54ec9d52/HB1354.330.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback