IN HB1350 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Environmental variances and other matters. Makes the following changes concerning variances from environmental rules: (1) If a variance would be in effect for more than one year: (A) the application for the variance must include a demonstration of how the applicant would come into compliance with the rule within the period for which the variance would be in effect; and (B) the variance, if granted, must include a compliance schedule requiring that compliance be achieved while the variance is in effect; and (C) the variance may be revoked for failure to comply with the compliance schedule. (2) Eliminates the renewal
Title
Environmental variances and other matters. Makes the following changes concerning variances from environmental rules: (1) If a variance would be in effect for more than one year: (A) the application for the variance must include a demonstration of how the applicant would come into compliance with the rule within the period for which the variance would be in effect; and (B) the variance, if granted, must include a compliance schedule requiring that compliance be achieved while the variance is in effect; and (C) the variance may be revoked for failure to comply with the compliance schedule. (2) Eliminates the renewal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Environmental Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Environmental Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 147 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2015-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 505: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 378: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second sponsor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | Senator Charbonneau added as sponsor |
2015-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2015-02-03 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Wolkins |