IN HB1348 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 281
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Administration of scholarships and grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administration of scholarships and grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 281
2013-05-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-26HouseConference committee report 2 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 641: yeas 85, nays 13
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 577: yeas 50, nays 0
2013-04-26SenateRules suspended
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : withdrawn
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-16SenateSenate advisors appointed: Charbonneau, Rogers and Walker
2013-04-16SenateSenate conferee appointed: Kenley and Taylor
2013-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Truitt and V. Smith
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Dermody and VanDenburgh
2013-04-11HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2013-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-04-10SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 436: yeas 50 and nays 0
2013-04-08SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2013-04-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-04-01SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2013-03-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2013-03-12SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
2013-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2013-02-25HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Kenley
2013-02-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 77, nays 18
2013-02-21HouseRepresentative VanDenburgh added as coauthor
2013-02-20HouseAmendment 1 (Dermody), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-20HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-19HouseRepresentative Morrison added as coauthor
2013-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-01-17HouseCoauthored by Representative Truitt
2013-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Dermody

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback