IN HB1345 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Property tax matters. Provides that if a for-profit land developer acquires land in inventory from a school corporation or a local unit of government, the land in inventory shall be assessed as agricultural land at the agricultural land base rate on the first assessment date immediately following the date on which the land developer acquires title to the land in inventory, and thereafter the land in inventory is subject to the usual provisions for reassessment of a land developer's land in inventory. Restores the property tax exemption for certain real property that is acquired for the purpose of erecting, renovating, or improving a single family residential structure that is to be given away or sold: (1) in a charitable manner; (2) by a nonprofit organization; and (3) to low income individuals who will use the land as a family residence. Provides a property tax exemption for assessment dates occurring after December 31, 2016, for certain property owned by an Indiana nonprofit public benefit corporation exempt from taxation under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code if: (1) the property is used in the operation of a nonprofit health, fitness, aquatics, and community center; and (2) the acquisition and development of the property are provided in part under the regional cities initiative of the Indiana economic development corporation. Allows a refund for any property taxes paid in 2018 and 2019 for property that qualifies for the exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax matters. Provides that if a for-profit land developer acquires land in inventory from a school corporation or a local unit of government, the land in inventory shall be assessed as agricultural land at the agricultural land base rate on the first assessment date immediately following the date on which the land developer acquires title to the land in inventory, and thereafter the land in inventory is subject to the usual provisions for reassessment of a land developer's land in inventory. Restores the property tax exemption for certain real property that is acquired for the purpose of erecting, renovating, or improving a single family residential structure that is to be given away or sold: (1) in a charitable manner; (2) by a nonprofit organization; and (3) to low income individuals who will use the land as a family residence. Provides a property tax exemption for assessment dates occurring after December 31, 2016, for certain property owned by an Indiana nonprofit public benefit corporation exempt from taxation under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code if: (1) the property is used in the operation of a nonprofit health, fitness, aquatics, and community center; and (2) the acquisition and development of the property are provided in part under the regional cities initiative of the Indiana economic development corporation. Allows a refund for any property taxes paid in 2018 and 2019 for property that qualifies for the exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePublic Law 85
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-25SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-03-21SenateSenator Spartz added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 299: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-03-19SenateSenator Alting added as cosponsor
2019-03-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Rogers, Doriot and Bohacek
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 74, nays 21
2019-02-18HouseRepresentative Pressel added as coauthor
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Miller D

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1345/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/e/5/23e5d3f5/HB1345.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/0/1/9c0198dd/HB1345.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/2/b/1e2b9b81/HB1345.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/e/d/b4ed6d20/HB1345.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/a/5/17a5c3b2/HB1345.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/6/6/e166109b/HB1345.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/5/a/735a5000/HB1345.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/e/b/cbebdf10/HB1345.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/0/4/6f04dc71/HB1345.227.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/8/1/6f81c71c/HB1345.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/9/b/ea9b4e6b/HB1345.299.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback